EP4243981 - SILICA-ALUMINA COMPOSITION COMPRISING FROM 1 TO 30 WT.% OF CRYSTALLINE AMMONIUM ALUMINUM CARBONATE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 5001 Executive Parkway San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2023/38] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583-0806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOTHIMURUGESAN, Kandaswamy San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 02 /
TIMKEN, Hye-Kyung Cho San Ramon, California 94583 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21746826.3 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021IB56626 | Priority number, date | US202063114086P | 16.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063114086 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022101693 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243981 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/12, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/03, B01J37/06, B01J37/30 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
B01J37/031 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,KR,US);
C01F7/34 (KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/647 (KR,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP,KR);
B01J37/033 (EP,KR);
B01J37/036 (EP,KR);
B01J37/04 (KR,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,KR);
B01J37/30 (EP,KR);
C01P2002/72 (KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (KR,US);
C01P2006/14 (KR,US);
C01P2006/16 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | SILICIUMDIOXID-ALUMINIUMOXID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT 1 BIS 30 GEWICHTSPROZENT KRISTALLINEM AMMONIUMALUMINIUMCARBONATHYDROXID UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/38] | English: | SILICA-ALUMINA COMPOSITION COMPRISING FROM 1 TO 30 WT.% OF CRYSTALLINE AMMONIUM ALUMINUM CARBONATE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2023/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SILICE-ALUMINE COMPRENANT DE 1 À 30 % EN POIDS D'HYDROXYDE DE CARBONATE D'ALUMINIUM ET D'AMMONIUM CRISTALLIN ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 11.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2392548 (SASOL ITALY S P A [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-20 * example -; claim -; table - * [I] 3,6,7,21; | [A]US2012122670 (POLLI ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-21* paragraph [0050]; example - * | by applicant | - X.H. LI et al., "MEMS 2012", Proc. 2012 Int. Conf. Mech. Eng. Mater. Sci., (20130000), pages 601 - 603 |