EP4084960 - FORCE SENSOR CONTROLLED CONDUCTIVE HEATING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liquid X Printed Metals, Inc. 252 Parkwest Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15275 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GWENGO, Chengeto 170 Edgewood Road Beaver Falls, Pennsylvania 15010 / US | 02 /
SWISHER, Robert 220 Hunt Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | 03 /
FISHER, Orin 393 Dodds Road Butler, Pennsylvania 16002 / US | 04 /
BABE, William 784 Carriage Circle Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania / US | 05 /
VASY, Beth 302 Joann Drive West Mifflin, Pennsylvania 15122 / US | 06 /
PETRAK, Christianna 1059 Union Avenue Brackenridge, Pennsylvania 15014 / US | 07 /
BABE, Gregory 699 Country Club Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15228 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Part.mbB Hohenzollernring 79-83 (Capitol) 50672 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Hohendorf Kierdorf Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hohenzollernring 79-83 (Capitol) 50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 21747914.6 | 01.02.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021US16080 | Priority number, date | US202062967858P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967858 P | US202062967883P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967883 P | US202062968007P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062968007 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155370 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084960 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06M23/16, D06M11/83, D06P5/30, B41M3/00, B41M5/00, B41M7/00, C09D11/037, C09D11/52, H05B3/34, D06M11/74, D06M13/188, D06M13/192 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/52 (EP,US);
B41M3/006 (US);
B41M5/0023 (US);
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
C09D11/033 (US);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09D11/32 (US);
C09D11/36 (US);
C09D11/38 (US);
D06M11/74 (EP);
D06M11/83 (EP);
D06M13/188 (EP);
D06M13/192 (EP);
D06M13/332 (EP);
D06M15/227 (EP);
D06M15/233 (EP);
D06M15/61 (EP);
D06M15/63 (EP);
D06M23/16 (EP);
D06P5/30 (EP);
G01L1/18 (US);
G01L5/22 (US);
H05B1/0213 (US);
H05B1/0238 (US);
H05B3/03 (US);
H05B3/12 (US);
H05B3/34 (EP,US);
H05K1/032 (US);
H05K1/038 (US);
H05K1/0393 (US);
H05K1/092 (US);
H05K3/125 (US);
B41M5/0011 (EP);
B41M5/0064 (EP);
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M7/009 (EP);
H05B2203/013 (EP,US);
H05B2203/029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | B41M3/00, B41M5/00, B41M7/00, C09D11/037, C09D11/52, H05B3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | KRAFTSENSORGESTEUERTE LEITENDE HEIZELEMENTE | [2022/45] | English: | FORCE SENSOR CONTROLLED CONDUCTIVE HEATING ELEMENTS | [2022/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE CHAUFFAGE CONDUCTEURS COMMANDÉS PAR UN CAPTEUR DE FORCE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009272197 (RIDAO GRANADO MIGUEL [ES], et al); | [Y]EP2654373 (GOODRICH CORP [US]); | [Y]EP3047794 (SENSING TEX S L [ES]); | [XY]US2019249026 (GWENGO CHENGETO [US], et al); | International search | [YA]US2008073130 (BULGAJEWSKI EDWARD F [US], et al); | [YA]WO2009132665 (STICHTING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL], et al); | [YA]US2011111138 (MCCULLOUGH RICHARD D [US], et al); | [YA]US2011240751 (RAUH HANS-GEORG [DE], et al); | [YA]WO2018032026 (WOLLSDORF LEDER SCHMIDT & CO GES M B H [AT]); | [XYA]US2019249026 (GWENGO CHENGETO [US], et al) |