EP4098489 - VEHICLE-MOUNTED ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOKOWO CO., LTD. 5-11, Takinogawa 7-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8515 / JP | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOWAITA, Kazuhiro c/o YOKOWO CO., LTD., TOMIOKA PLANT, 1112, Kanohara Tomioka-Shi, Gunma 370-2495 / JP | 02 /
IEDA, Hiroto c/o YOKOWO CO., LTD., TOMIOKA PLANT, 1112, Kanohara Tomioka-Shi, Gunma 370-2495 / JP | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21748197.7 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021JP00303 | Priority number, date | JP20200011871 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020011871 | [2022/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021153179 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098489 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32, H01Q9/28, H01Q21/24 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q5/307 (US);
B60R11/02 (US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q9/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | B60R11/02, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/32, H01Q9/28, H01Q21/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGMONTIERTE ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | VEHICLE-MOUNTED ANTENNA DEVICE | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | Translation filed | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 26.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6211840 (WOOD PETER JOHN [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 3-9 *; | [A]US6313809 (GABRIEL ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [IA]US6342867 (BELL H CLARK [US]) [I] 1,4,7-9,11-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 5, line 5 * [A] 2,3,5,6,10; | [XAI]US2010117914 (FELLER WALTER [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,7-9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 2,3,5,6,10 [I] 13,14 | International search | [A]JPS5765010 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14; | [A]GB2316233 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-14; | [A]JP2014079008 (ALCATEL LUCENT)[A] 1-14; | [A]JP2014527360 [A] 1-14 | by applicant | US7277056 | US7528780 | JP2018182362 | JP2019041240 | JP2020011871 |