EP4179102 - OLIGOSACCHARIDE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Margit 4000 Roskilde / DK | 02 /
PAPADAKIS, Manos 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 03 /
BECKER, Peter 2830 Virum / DK | 04 /
SAMAIN, Eric 38610 Gières / FR | 05 /
PELTIER-PAIN, Pauline 45100 Orléans / FR | 06 /
KAMPMANN, Katrine Bych 2500 Valby / DK | 07 /
JOHANSON, Ted 2830 Virum / DK | 08 /
CHAMPION, Elise 31400 Toulouse / FR | 09 /
DEKANY, Gyula Sinnamon Park, Queensland 4073 / AU | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 21748487.2 | 12.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021EP69310 | Priority number, date | DK2020PA00838 | 13.07.2020 Original published format: DK PA202000838 | US202016927700 | 13.07.2020 Original published format: US202016927700 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022013143 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179102 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/00, C12P19/04, C12P19/12, C12P19/18, C12P19/26, C07K14/255, C07K14/26, C12N9/12, C12N9/24, C12N15/52 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP);
C07K14/255 (EP);
C07K14/26 (EP);
C12N9/1205 (EP);
C12N9/2402 (EP);
C12P19/00 (EP);
C12P19/04 (EP);
C12P19/12 (EP);
C12P19/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON OLIGOSACCHARIDEN | [2023/20] | English: | OLIGOSACCHARIDE PRODUCTION | [2023/20] | French: | PRODUCTION D'OLIGOSACCHARIDE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 20.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 20.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2023 | Decision despatched | 20.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2014067696 (JENNEWEIN BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document * * example 1 *; | [YD]WO2015150328 (JENNEWEIN BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document * * example 1 * * table 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2015197082 (GLYCOM AS [DK]) [Y] 1,2,4-23 * the whole document * * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 6 * * examples 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [YD]WO2019043029 (JENNEWEIN BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document * * examples 1,2 *; | [YD]WO2019076941 (JENNEWEIN BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document * * examples 1-5 *; | [YD]WO2019123324 (GLYCOM AS [DK]) [YD] 3* the whole document * | by applicant | GB2155935 | WO0104341 | EP1149911 | EP1911850 | WO2009040363 | WO2010051849 | WO2010070104 | EP2239336 | EP2371952 | EP2405006 | WO2012007481 | WO2012078311 | WO2012112777 | WO2013182206 | WO2014048439 | WO2014067696 | WO2015150328 | WO2019043029 | WO2019076941 | WO2019123324 | WO2020115671 | - PRIEM et al., Glycobiology, (20020000), vol. 12, page 235 | - FORT et al., Chem. Comm., (20050000), page 2558 | - DROUILLARD et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20060000), vol. 45, page 1778 | - LEE et al., Microb. Cell Fact, (20120000), vol. 11, page 48 | - BAUMGARTNER et al., Microb. Cell Fact, (20130000), vol. 12, page 40 | - BRUSCHI et al., Biotechnol. Adv., (20120000), vol. 30, page 1001 | - SABRI et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol, (20130000), vol. 79, page 478 | - KIM et al., Biores. Technol., (20130000), vol. 130, page 288 | - KHAMDUANG et al., J. Ind. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 36, page 1267 | - FORT et al., J. Chem. Soc., Chem. Comm., (20050000), page 2558 | - CHEN, Adv. Carbohydr. Chem. Biochem., (20150000), vol. 72, page 113 | - SAMAIN et al., J. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 72, page 33 | - WARMING et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20050000), vol. 33, page e36 | - HERRING et al., Gene, (20030000), vol. 311, page 153 |