EP4193008 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GROWING A RARE EARTH SESQUIOXIDE CRYSTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungsverbund Berlin E.V. Rudower Chaussee 17 12489 Berlin / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄNKEL, Christian 10317 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HAURAT, Emile 4450 LA BAULE / FR | 03 /
UVAROVA, Anastasia 12489 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KLIMM, Detlef 15732 Eichwalde / DE | 05 /
GUGUSCHEV, Christo 12524 Berlin / DE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21748512.7 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP68687 | Priority number, date | DE202010120715 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020120715 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028800 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193008 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/10, C30B29/22, C30B35/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
C30B29/22 (EP);
C30B15/10 (EP);
C30B35/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZÜCHTEN EINES SELTENERD-SESQUIOXID-KRISTALLS | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GROWING A RARE EARTH SESQUIOXIDE CRYSTAL | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CROISSANCE D'UN CRISTAL DE SESQUIOXYDE DE TERRES RARES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4444728 (LANAM RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 5-12 * claims 1,2 *; | [XAI]CN101871125 (UNIV SHANDONG) [X] 14,16-19 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 18] , [0 21] , [0 79] - [0081] - [0 85] - [0087]; examples 14,16; claims 1,4 * [A] 1-13 [I] 15; | [XI]US2016160383 (VEBER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 5-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 63] , [0 86] , [0 87]; claim 1 * [I] 15; | [X]JP2019172521 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 5-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0017]; claims 1,4 *; | [XAI]CN111041558 (SHANGHAI INST OPTICS & FINE MECH CAS) [X] 1-14,16,18,19 * paragraph [0018]; example 2; claim 1 * [A] 17 [I] 15; | [A] - KRANKEL CHRISTIAN, "Rare-Earth-Doped Sesquioxides for Diode-Pumped High-Power Lasers in the 1-, 2-, and 3-[mu]m Spectral R", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE, USA, vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JSTQE.2014.2346618, ISSN 1077-260X, (20150101), pages 1 - 13, (20140910), XP011558373 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTQE.2014.2346618 | by applicant | US3898051 | US4303465 | DE19702465 | - VON BADIE, J.M., Etüde de la structure des phases ä haute temperature presentees pas les systemes S 0 -La 0 et S 0 -Nd 0, aus High Temp. - High Press., (19700000), vol. 2, pages 309 - 316 | - "Growth technology and laser properties of Ybdoped sesquioxides", PETERS, R.K. PETERMANNG. HUBER, aus Crystal Growth Technology, WILEY-VCH Verlag GmbH, (20100000), pages 267 - 282 |