EP4193095 - METHOD AND INSTALLATIONS FOR PROVIDING ENERGY, PARTICULARLY THERMAL ENERGY, IN AT LEAST ONE BUILDING OR THE LIKE, AND RELATED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenta 696 rue Yves Kermen 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREMOLIERES, Pierre 91400 ORSAY / FR | 02 /
BRUAND, Philippe 78110 LE VESINET / FR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21749057.2 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP71882 | Priority number, date | FR20200008303 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: FR 2008303 | [2023/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029235 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193095 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10, F24D3/08, F24D11/02, F24D17/00, F24D17/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
F24D19/1045 (EP);
F24H15/152 (US);
F24D11/00 (US);
F24D11/0221 (EP);
F24D17/0015 (EP);
F24D17/0036 (EP);
F24D17/02 (EP);
F24D19/1078 (EP);
F24D3/08 (EP);
F24H15/262 (US);
F24H15/265 (US);
F24H15/269 (US);
F24H15/296 (US);
F24D2200/02 (EP);
F24D2200/11 (EP,US);
F24D2200/12 (EP);
F24D2200/14 (EP);
F24D2200/32 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B10/40 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ENERGIE, INSBESONDERE WÄRMEENERGIE, IN MINDESTENS EINEM GEBÄUDE ODER DERGLEICHEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES SYSTEM | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATIONS FOR PROVIDING ENERGY, PARTICULARLY THERMAL ENERGY, IN AT LEAST ONE BUILDING OR THE LIKE, AND RELATED SYSTEM | [2023/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATIONS POUR FOURNIR DE L'ENERGIE NOTAMMENT THERMIQUE DANS AU MOINS UN BATIMENT OU ANALOGUE, ET SYSTEME S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 02.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0215365 (NISOURCE ENERGY TECHNOLOGIES [US]); | [XI]EP3196559 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [XI]DE102016015503 (CONSOLAR SOLARE ENERGIESYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE10022544 | US2008092875 | EP2141419 | FR2960099 | DE102010033909 | KR20130017182 | WO2015014951 | EP3012539 | EP1987298 | KR101801775B | US2018283799 | FR3065516 |