EP4196422 - BUILDING SYSTEM WITH ELEVATOR CALL ENTRY VIA OFFLINE QR CODE CREDENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Samuel Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
WONG, Jack Hong Kong / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21749853.4 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP71245 | Priority number, date | EP20200190840 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20190840 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033882 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196422 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/46 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B66B1/468 (EP,US);
B66B1/3461 (US);
B66B2201/4638 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | GEBÄUDESYSTEM MIT AUFZUGSRUFEINGABE ÜBER OFFLINE-QR-CODEBERECHTIGUNG | [2023/25] | English: | BUILDING SYSTEM WITH ELEVATOR CALL ENTRY VIA OFFLINE QR CODE CREDENTIAL | [2023/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BÂTIMENT À ENTRÉE D'APPEL D'ASCENSEUR PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN JUSTIFICATIF D'IDENTITÉ SOUS FORME DE CODE QR HORS LIGNE | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 16.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.06.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP2005280882 [ ]; | [A]JP2005280882 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 10 *; | [A]WO2008046173 (THYSSENKRUPP ELEVADORES S A [BR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 13 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2012068818 (MIZON JOHN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XA]US2016009525 (DEPAOLA PETER [US], et al) [X] 11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-10,12,13 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 71, Database accession no. 2005-686485, & JP2005280882 A 20051013 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR & BUILDING SYSTEMS CORP) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | WO2015049186 | US9077716 |