EP4100670 - BALL VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cameron Technologies Limited Parkstraat 83 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGOSTI, Diego Via Italo Betto 11 27058 Voghera / IT | 02 /
RICOTTI, Federico Via Italo Betto 11 27058 Voghera / IT | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21750235.0 | 02.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021US16178 | Priority number, date | EP20200425005 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20425005 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158524 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100670 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K27/06, F16K5/20 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
F16K5/0605 (EP,US);
F16K5/201 (US);
F16K27/067 (EP,US);
F16K5/0689 (EP,US);
F16K5/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | F16K5/06, F16K27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | KUGELVENTILANORDNUNG | [2022/50] | English: | BALL VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2022/50] | French: | ENSEMBLE CLAPET À BILLE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3254873 (KNOX GRANVILLE S); | [Y]JPS4726020U ; | [Y]US5676347 (KNOX GRANVILLE S [US]); | [A]JPH10132099 (DAIMEI SHOJI KK) | International search | [Y]JPS4726020U ; | [Y]US5676347 (KNOX GRANVILLE S [US]); | [A]JPH10132099 (DAIMEI SHOJI KK); | [A]JPH11351420 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]CN206655981U (ZHEJIANG BAOFENG VALVE CO LTD) | by applicant | US5676347 |