EP4101576 - DUAL-PHASE STAINLESS CLAD STEEL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAYAMA, Hikaru c/o JFE STEEL CORPORATION Intellectual Property Dept. 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KURONUMA, Yota c/o JFE STEEL CORPORATION Intellectual Property Dept. 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
SAMUSAWA, Itaru c/o JFE STEEL CORPORATION Intellectual Property Dept. 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
SHIMAMURA, Junji c/o JFE STEEL CORPORATION Intellectual Property Dept. 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21750540.3 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021JP03047 | Priority number, date | JP20200018750 | 06.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020018750 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157465 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101576 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/04, C22C38/52, C22C38/54, C22C38/50, C22C38/48, C22C38/46, C21D9/46, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/02, C21D6/00, C22C38/58, C22C38/60, C21D1/02, B32B15/01, C21D8/02 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B32B15/011 (EP);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D6/004 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/021 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/008 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/46 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
C22C38/52 (EP);
C22C38/54 (EP);
C22C38/58 (EP);
C22C38/60 (EP);
C21D2211/001 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | B23K20/04, C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/58, C22C38/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | ZWEIPHASIGER PLATTIERTER EDELSTAHL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/50] | English: | DUAL-PHASE STAINLESS CLAD STEEL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2022/50] | French: | ACIER PLAQUÉ INOXYDABLE À DEUX PHASES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | Translation filed | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2013209688 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [A] 1-3 * § 0057;; tables 1-3 *; | [X]WO2019128363 (NANJING IRON & STEEL CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3 * § 0028, 0030, 0032, 0035, 0037, 0039, 0040, 0043; tab. 1; last 2 rows *; | [A]WO2019189708 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3* tables 1-4 *; | [A] - IRVING MELVIN BERNSTEIN ET AL, "Residual and Minor Elements in Stainless Steels", HANDBOOK OF STAINLESS STEELS, XX, XX, (19770101), pages 14 - 1, XP002430954 [A] 1-3 * p. 2 * | International search | [A]WO2018139513 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3; | [A]WO2019189708 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3; | [A]WO2019189871 (NIPPON STEEL STAINLESS STEEL CORP [JP])[A] 1-3 | by applicant | JP2014114466 | JP2018028146 |