EP4074868 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE FOR DRY ELECTROPOLISHING OF METALS WITH ACTIVITY MODERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drylyte, S.L. C/. Salvador Alarma nº 16 08035 Barcelona / ES | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOTO HERNANDEZ, Marc AV. ARAGON 27 08105 SANT FOST DE CAMPSENTELLES (BARCELONA) / ES | 02 /
SARSANEDAS GIMPERA, Marc C/ BISBE VILANOVA 1BIS, 4-1 17800 OLOT (GIRONA) / ES | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Espiell Gomez, Ignacio R. Volart Pons y Cia., S.L. Pau Claris, 77 2º 1ª 08010 Barcelona / ES | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21750915.7 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/42] | WO2021ES70065 | Priority number, date | ES20200030082 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: ES 202030082 | [2022/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156531 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074868 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C25F3/16, C09G1/02, C09K13/00, B23H5/12, C25F3/24 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP,ES);
C25F3/16 (ES);
C25F3/24 (EP,US);
C09K13/00 (ES);
B23H5/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | C25F3/16, C09G1/02, C09K13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT FÜR DAS TROCKENE ELEKTROPOLIEREN VON METALLEN MIT AKTIVITÄTSMODERATOR | [2022/42] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE FOR DRY ELECTROPOLISHING OF METALS WITH ACTIVITY MODERATOR | [2022/42] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE POUR L'ÉLECTROPOLISSAGE À SEC DE MÉTAUX AVEC UN MODÉRATEUR D'ACTIVITÉ | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2022 | Translation filed | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002077035 (WANG YUCHUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]ES2734500 (DRYLYTE SL [ES]) [Y] 1-7* example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US2001020348 (UEDA KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , Parrafos [37 - 38]. *; | [A]US2002077035 (WANG YUCHUN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * , Párrafos 32 - 38]. *; | [Y]US2004148867 (MATSUMI YASUO [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , párrafo [7]; párrafos [23 - 24]; ejemplo 1. *; | [A]WO2008005164 (CABOT MICROELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-13* , párrafos [23 - 25]. *; | [A]WO2015101034 (SH INTEGRATED CIRCUIT RES & DE [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , párrafos [ 8 - 10]. *; | [Y]WO2019145588 (DRYLYTE SL [ES]) [Y] 1-13 * , página 6. *; | [Y]ES2734415 (DRYLYTE SL [ES]) [Y] 1-13 * , ejemplos 1-3. * | by applicant | ES2604830 | ES2721170 |