EP4102604 - SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMASA, Yoshitaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751020.5 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021JP02192 | Priority number, date | JP20200019894 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020019894 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157383 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102604 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102604 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/052, H01M10/0587, H01M50/531 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP);
H01M4/662 (EP,US);
H01M10/0587 (US);
H01M4/134 (US);
H01M50/534 (EP);
H01M50/536 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/50] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/50] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | Translation filed | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 09.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2018045975 (JET CO LTD) [A] 1-6* [0007], 3 *; | [A]JP2018094559 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6 * [0012],[0019],[0023] *; | [A]JP2019126822 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [A] 1-6 * [0012], [0031], [0043], 5 *; | [A]JP2019153438 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-6 * [0014]-[0015], [0024], [0026], [0062] * | by applicant | JP2010282846 |