EP4099985 - METHODS AND USE FOR BIOENGINEERING ENUCLEATED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 8th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEMKE, Richard 9500 Gilman Drive La Jolla, California 92093-0910 / US | 02 /
WANG, Huawei 9500 Gilman Drive La Jolla, California 92093-0910 / US | 03 /
PI, Willie 9500 Gilman Drive La Jolla, California 92093-0910 / US | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751113.8 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021US16919 | Priority number, date | US202062971526P | 07.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062971526 P | US202062993967P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062993967 P | US202062994598P | 25.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994598 P | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158991 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099985 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K31/165, A61K31/337, A61K31/407, A61K31/537 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/5068 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/13 (US);
A61K38/208 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1271 (KR);
A61P35/00 (US);
C12N5/0663 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K35/28 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K48/0008 (KR);
A61K48/005 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG FÜR DAS BIOENGINEERING VON ENUKLEIERTEN ZELLEN | [2022/50] | English: | METHODS AND USE FOR BIOENGINEERING ENUCLEATED CELLS | [2022/50] | French: | MÉTHODES ET UTILISATION POUR LA MODIFICATION GÉNÉTIQUE DE CELLULES ÉNUCLÉÉES | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017123644 (RUBIUS THERAPEUTICS INC [US])[A] 1-15; | [X]WO2019126818 (RUBIUS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,12,14 * page 157, line 1 - line 14; claims 75-79 * * page 32, line 7 - line 11 *; | [XY] - KLEMKE RICHARD L. ET AL, "Abstract LB-067: Cargocytes: A novel cell therapy platform to drive anti-tumor immunity", CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 79, no. 13_Supplement, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-LB-067, ISSN 0008-5472, (20190701), pages B - 067, URL: https://aacrjournals.org/cancerres/article/79/13_Supplement/LB-067/637931/Abstract-LB-067-Cargocytes-A-novel-cell-therapy, XP093124220 [X] 1-5,12-14 * abstract * [Y] 6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-LB-067 | [XPY] - Alarcón Christina Nicole, "Therapeutic Functions of Bioengineered, Enucleated Cells A dissertation submitted in partial satisfaction of the requirements for the degree Doctor of Philosophy in Biomedical Sciences by", Ph.D. Thesis, (2020), URL: https://escholarship.org/content/qt4g7729kq/qt4g7729kq_noSplash_1cedb8d3031558ea3efcecbe0adc295f.pdf?t=q7fsf3, (20240126), XP093124223 [XP] 1-5,11-14 * Part 3.3;; figure 8 * [Y] 6-8 | [AP] - GALLUZZI LORENZO ET AL, "Immunostimulation with chemotherapy in the era of immune checkpoint inhibitors", NATURE REVIEWS CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, NATURE, NY, US, vol. 17, no. 12, doi:10.1038/S41571-020-0413-Z, ISSN 1759-4774, (20200805), pages 725 - 741, (20200805), XP037298633 [AP] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41571-020-0413-z | International search | [A]US2002142397 (COLLAS PHILIPPE [NO], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011286978 (KLIMANSKAYA IRINA V [US], et al) [Y] 11, 12 * entire document *; | [A]US2012107347 (HODGE JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2016082046 (LODISH HARVEY [US], et al) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [XY]WO2019032628 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-10, 13-19 * entire document * [Y] 11, 12; | [A]US2019298769 (WICKHAM THOMAS JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document * |