EP4102267 - PRISM ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sang Ok 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seong Min 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751250.8 | 04.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021KR01465 | Priority number, date | KR20200014405 | 06.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200014405 | [2022/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158033 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102267 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/04, G02B7/18, G02B27/64, H04N23/55 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04N23/55 (EP);
G02B5/04 (KR);
G02B13/0065 (US);
G02B26/0825 (US);
G02B27/646 (EP);
G02B7/1805 (EP,US);
G03B17/17 (EP);
G03B30/00 (EP,US);
G03B5/00 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
G03B2205/0023 (EP);
G03B2205/003 (US);
G03B2205/0076 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | G02B5/04, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | PRISMENBETÄTIGUNGSELEMENT | [2022/50] | English: | PRISM ACTUATOR | [2022/50] | French: | ACTIONNEUR À PRISME | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | Translation filed | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018135732 (JAHWA ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* figures 3-5 *; | [XAI]KR20190114588 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 47] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [0 56] , [0 58] , [0 70] , [0 71]; figures 1, 3-6 * [A] 5 [I] 8,9,13 | International search | [A]JP2009526257 (NOKIA CORPORATION) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0015] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]KR20090081855 (E PIN OPTICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0022] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]WO2018158590 (CAMBRIDGE MECHATRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10* See claim 1 and figure 8. *; | [Y]US2018321504 (HU CHAO-CHANG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0073] and figures 2-3D. *; | [Y]JP2020008650 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD ) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraph [0029] and figures 1A-12. * |