EP4100521 - MAGNETIC MANIPULATION THROUGH SOLID-STATE METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics, Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIA, Philip 6115 Barrett Ave. El Cerrito, California 94530 / US | 02 /
WOLDEMARIAM, Melaku 14085 Reed Ave. San Leandro, California 94578 / US | 03 /
BLIZARD, Ben 424 Staten Ave. Apt. 401 Oakland, California 94610 / US | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751401.7 | 26.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021US70079 | Priority number, date | US202062969713P | 04.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062969713 P | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021159135 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100521 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, B01F33/451, H01F1/44, H01F7/06, H01F7/20, // B03C1/01, B03C1/033, B03C1/28 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C12N15/1013 (EP,US);
B01F33/451 (EP,US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
B03C1/0335 (EP,US);
B03C1/288 (EP,US);
H01F1/44 (EP);
H01F7/064 (EP);
H01F7/206 (EP);
B01F2101/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | C12N15/10, B01F13/08, B03C1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE MANIPULATION DURCH FESTKÖRPERVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/50] | English: | MAGNETIC MANIPULATION THROUGH SOLID-STATE METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/50] | French: | MANIPULATION MAGNÉTIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCÉDÉ ET D'UN APPAREIL À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5546006 (LOUGE MICHEL Y [US]) [A] 8,12,14,15* figure 2 *; | [YA]US2014135198 (RAJAGOPAL ADITYA [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * figure 6 * [A] 1,5-15; | [A]US2015300938 (DEBRECZENY MARTIN P [US], et al) [A] 7,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0153] , [0154] *; | [XAYI]US2018369831 (ARNOLD DON W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] , [0082] , [0086] * * figure 9 * [A] 7,8,12-15 [Y] 2-4 [I] 9-11; | [XAYI]US2020011773 (ARNOLD DON W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0043] , [0048] , [0049] * * figure 2 * [A] 7,8,12-15 [Y] 2-4 [I] 10,11 | International search | [Y]US5546006 (LOUGE MICHEL Y [US]) [Y] 8, 15* entire document, especially col 3, In 48 -64; col 4, In 14-17 *; | [Y]US2014135198 (RAJAGOPAL ADITYA [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * entire document, especially para [0033] *; | [Y]US2015300938 (DEBRECZENY MARTIN P [US], et al) [Y] 7, 13-16 * entire document, especially para [0123], [0149], [0153] *; | [XY]US2020011773 (ARNOLD DON W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-12 * entire document, especially Fig. 2, para [0037], [0038], [0040], [0041], [0043], [0049], [0053], [0055], [0060], [0062] * [Y] 2-4, 7, 8,13-16 | by applicant | US2013217144 | US2017284922 | US2020011773 |