EP4101467 - AGENT FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING PANCREATIC FISTULA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOF Corporation 20-3 Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6019 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Yuichiro c/o FUJITA HEALTH UNIVERSITY, FUJITA ACADEMY, 1- 98, Dengakugakubo, Kutsukake-cho Toyoake-shi, Aichi 470-1192 / JP | 02 /
MASUI, Toshihiko c/o Kyoto University Hospital, 54, Shogoin Kawahara-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | 03 /
TABATA, Yasuhiko c/o Institute for Frontier Life and Medical Sciences, Kyoto University, 53, Shogoin Kawahara- cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21751414.0 | 03.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021JP03953 | Priority number, date | JP20200018309 | 05.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020018309 | JP20200167881 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020167881 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157619 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101467 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61P1/18, A61P41/00, A61P43/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/10, A61K9/107, A61K47/10, A61K47/34, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K47/42, A61K31/17, A61K31/365, A61K31/536, A61K9/00, A61K31/4545 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61P1/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/536 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4545, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/536, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | A61K45/00, A61P1/18, A61P41/00, A61P43/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/10, A61K9/107, A61K47/10, A61K47/34, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K47/42, A61K31/17, A61K31/365, A61K31/536 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG VON PANKREASFISTELN | [2022/50] | English: | AGENT FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING PANCREATIC FISTULA | [2022/50] | French: | AGENT POUR TRAITER OU PRÉVENIR UNE FISTULE PANCRÉATIQUE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2022 | Translation filed | 31.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007123338 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [X] 9 * claim - *; | [X]CN101352454 (BIN CUI [CN]) [X] 9* claim - *; | [X]EP2392327 (UNIVERSITAETSMEDIZIN DER JOHANNES GUTENBERG UNI MAINZ [DE], et al) [X] 9,13-15 * Composition G, Table 7 * | International search | [A]JP2015112041 (UNIV NAGASAKI) [A] 1-16* in particular, claims, etc. *; | [XY] - Kawakami, Yusuke et al. , "PS-135-8 Suppression of pancreatic fistula using drugs-Verification using a rat pancreatic fistula model", The 117th Annual Congress of Japan Surgical Society, (20161130), vol. 117, page 2037, XP009538931 [X] 1-4, 7, 8 [Y] 9-16 | [XY] - Kemmochi, Akira et al., "PS-198-7 Development of treatment method in pancreatic fistula using new hydrogel preparation", Abstracts of the 118th Annual Congress of Japan Surgical Society; April 5-7, 2018, Japan Surgical Society, JP, JP , (20180401), page 2469, XP009538806 [X] 1-4, 7, 8 [Y] 9-16 | [Y] - Aimoto, Takayuki, "S1-3 Aiming for pancreaticodigestive anastomosis without pancreatic fistula -Significance of administration of bFGF-impregnated gelatin hydrogel", Programs and abstracts of the Annual Meeting of Japanese Society for Wound Healing; Tokyo, Japan; December 2-3, 2010, JP, (20091130), vol. 40, page 38, XP009538953 [Y] 9-16 | [XY] - Uchida Y, Masui T, Nakano K, Yogo A, Sato A, Nagai K, Anazawa T, Takaori K, Tabata Y, Uemoto S, "Clinical and experimental studies of intraperitoneal lipolysis and the development of clinically relevant pancreatic fistula after pancreatic surgery.", British Journal of Surgery, (20190000), vol. 106, no. 5, ISSN 0007-1323, pages 616 - 625, XP055845769 [X] 1-8 * , in particular, abstract, fig. 1-3, pp. 622-624 * [Y] 9-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bjs.11075 | [XY] - Uchida, Yuichiro, "SF-032-6 Pancreatic fistula becomes severe due to lipolysis: Elucidation of a mechanism using clinical specimen and animal models", Abstracts of the 119th Annual Congress of Japan Surgical Society, April 18-20, 2019, JP, (20190000), vol. 119, page 1186, XP009538932 [X] 1-4, 7, 8 [Y] 9-16 | [XY] - Uchida, Yuichiro et al., "RS35-6 Lipolysis and pancreatic impairment: Elucidation of the mechanism of severe pancreatic fistula in visceral obesity", Abstracts of The General Meeting of the Japanese Society of Gastroenterological Surgery; Tokyo, Japan; July 7-17, 2019, (20181130), vol. 74, page 915, XP009538954 [X] 1-4, 7, 8 [Y] 9-16 | [A] - Kawaida, Hiromichi et al., "P08-2 Analysis of risk factors for pancreatic juice leakage in pancreatic resection using a Triple-row stapler in pancreas tail excision", Programs and abstracts of Japanese Society of Pancreatic Surgery; August 19-20, 2017, JP, (20161130), vol. 43, page 94, XP009538957 [A] 1-16 | [A] - PORSGAARD, T. et al., "Effect of orlistat on fat absorption in rats: A comparison of normal rats and rats with diverted bile and pancreatic juice", Lipids, (20030000), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 1039 - 1043, XP055845777 [A] 1-16 * , in particular, abstract, fig. 1-4 * | by applicant | JPS6013777 | JP2020018309 | JP2020167881 | - Surgery, (20170000), vol. 161, pages 584 - 591 |