EP4185783 - SPUTTER DEPOSITION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOx Biosystems NV Bioville Agoralaan Abis 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states FOx Biosystems NV Bioville Agoralaan Abis 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELPORT, Filip 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | 02 /
FEJTOVA, Hana 9800 Deinze / BE | 03 /
FEJT, Tomas 102 00 Prague 10 / CZ | 04 /
ROSKOVSKY, Rudolf 142 00 Prague Kamyk / CZ | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21751525.3 | 23.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021EP70734 | Priority number, date | EP20200187737 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: EP 20187737 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018282 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185783 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4185783 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/50, C23C14/04 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C23C14/505 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (US);
C23C14/044 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | F16C19/22, C23C14/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPUTTERABSCHEIDUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/52] | English: | SPUTTER DEPOSITION SYSTEM | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPÔT PAR PULVÉRISATION | [2023/22] |
Former [2023/22] | SPUTTER-BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24171254.6 / EP4400626 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH10219447 (FUJITSU LTD); | [IA]US2002062791 (GINOVKER ANDREY [CA], et al); | [IA]US2005126497 (KIDD JERRY D [US], et al); | [A]US2010104749 (ZHAO YIPING [US], et al); | [IA]CN103361616B ; | [A]CN110129753 (LASER FUSION RES CT CHINA ACADEMY ENGINEERING PHYSICS) | Examination | DE3933911 | CN108505011 | by applicant | WO2007106732 |