EP4179028 - LASER POST TREATMENT OF METAL EFFECT PIGMENT SURFACES FOR LOCALLY INCREASING RADAR AND/OR LIGHT TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlenk Metallic Pigments GmbH Barnsdorfer Hauptstrasse 5 91154 Roth / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAILE, Frank Jochen 91154 Roth / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Stütz, Jan Unter den Linden 10 10117 Berlin / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21751963.6 | 11.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021DE100605 | Priority number, date | DE202010118344 | 11.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020118344 | [2023/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022012718 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179028 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, B41M5/00, C09D5/02, C09D7/61, G01S7/40, H01Q1/00, H01Q3/00 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,KR);
B05D3/06 (EP,KR);
B22F1/05 (US);
B05D3/007 (EP,KR);
B22F1/142 (US);
G01S7/027 (EP,KR);
H01Q1/42 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | LASER NACHBEHANDLUNG VON METALLEFFEKTPIGMENTFLÄCHEN ZUR LOKALEN ERHÖHUNG DER RADAR- UND/ ODER LICHTTRANSMISSION | [2023/20] | English: | LASER POST TREATMENT OF METAL EFFECT PIGMENT SURFACES FOR LOCALLY INCREASING RADAR AND/OR LIGHT TRANSMISSION | [2023/20] | French: | POST-TRAITEMENT LASER DE SURFACES PIGMENTAIRES À EFFET MÉTALLIQUE POUR AUGMENTER LOCALEMENT LA TRANSMISSION RADAR ET/OU LUMINEUSE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |