EP4188877 - METHOD FOR RECYCLING CARBONACEOUS BY-PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Ceramics Les Cinq Chemins Rue de Touban 33185 Le Haillan / FR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTIN, Jean-François, Daniel, René 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
MAISSE, Laurent 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21752081.6 | 20.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021FR51354 | Priority number, date | FR20200008126 | 30.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2008126 | [2023/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023642 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188877 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4188877 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/05, C04B35/83, C04B35/622 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
C01B32/05 (EP,US);
C04B35/62204 (EP,US);
C04B35/83 (EP,US);
C04B2235/614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN NEBENPRODUKTEN | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD FOR RECYCLING CARBONACEOUS BY-PRODUCTS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECYCLAGE DE SOUS-PRODUITS CARBONES | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9511867 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0835853 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]WO2020120857 (SAFRAN CERAM [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - MCALLISTER P ET AL, "Ni-Catalyzed carbon infiltration of carbon-fiber substrates", CARBON, ELSEVIER OXFORD, GB, vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0008-6223(92)90079-C, ISSN 0008-6223, (19920101), pages 189 - 200, (19920101), XP024357130 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [Experimental methods] * * paragraph [Introduction] * * paragraph [Conclusions] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6223(92)90079-C |