EP4178892 - BLANK FEEDING UNIT FOR A PACKER MACHINE AND PROVIDED WITH A POSITION REFERENCE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARBONI, Salvatore 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
VITALI, Antonio 40133 Bologna / IT | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21752163.2 | 08.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021IB56132 | Priority number, date | IT20200016717 | 09.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000016717 | [2023/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022009138 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178892 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/02 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
B65H1/025 (EP,US);
B65H2404/71 (EP,US);
B65H2405/212 (EP,US);
B65H2407/20 (EP);
B65H2701/1764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | ZUSCHNITTZUFÜHREINHEIT FÜR EINE VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINEM POSITIONSREFERENZELEMENT | [2023/20] | English: | BLANK FEEDING UNIT FOR A PACKER MACHINE AND PROVIDED WITH A POSITION REFERENCE ELEMENT | [2023/20] | French: | UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION D'ÉBAUCHE POUR UNE MACHINE DE GARNITURE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET POURVUE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITION | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9006275 (SPRINTER SYSTEM AB [SE]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]EP0816268 (TOKYO AUTOMATIC MACH WORKS [JP]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US7594646 (FLAGG MICHAEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-6,20-24 * the whole document * [A] 18,19 [I] 7-17 |