EP4209117 - COOKTOP DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COOKTOP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | 03.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL CUETO BELCHI, Alejandro 50016 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
ESPAÑOL LEZA, Jorge 50009 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
FELICES BETRAN, Jorge 22003 Huesca / ES | 04 /
FERNANDEZ MARTINEZ, Manuel 50006 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
GIL NARVION, Jose Miguel 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 06 /
HERNANDEZ BLASCO, Pablo Jesus 50019 Zaragoza / ES | 07 /
IMAZ MARTINEZ, Eduardo 31500 Tudela (Navarra) / ES | 08 /
MURESAN, Paul 50720 La Cartuja / ES | 09 /
PALACIOS GASOS, Jose Manuel 50018 Zaragoza / ES | 10 /
PEREZ BOSQUE, Alberto 50018 Zaragoza / ES | 11 /
PUYAL PUENTE, Diego 50014 Zaragoza / ES | 12 /
SERRANO TRULLEN, Javier 50017 Zaragoza / ES | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21752568.2 | 02.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021EP71536 | Priority number, date | EP20200382783 | 02.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20382783 | [2023/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048839 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209117 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H05B6/065 (EP,US);
H05B6/1272 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | KOCHFELDVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER KOCHFELDVORRICHTUNG | [2023/28] | English: | COOKTOP DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COOKTOP DEVICE | [2023/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TABLE DE CUISSON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TABLE DE CUISSON | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013248517 (MOON HYUNWOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figures 4,5,7,8 *; | [X]EP3028540 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP3641497 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0128]; figure 10 *; | [A]EP3641494 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0127]; figure 7a * |