EP4065247 - CONTROLLER WITH SENSOR-RICH CONTROLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valve Corporation 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANWYK, Eric Judson 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 02 /
WHIPPLE, Lucas Allen 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 03 /
PETERSEN, Walter 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 04 /
MUCHA, Jeffrey Walter 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 05 /
DALTON, Scott 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 06 /
GRIFFAIS, Pierre-Loup Miguel 10400 NE 4th Street Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21753299.3 | 12.02.2021 | [2022/40] | WO2021US17926 | Priority number, date | US202062977030P | 14.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062977030 P | US202117174167 | 11.02.2021 Original published format: US202117174167 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163540 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065247 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/214, A63F13/218, A63F13/245, A63F13/24, A63F13/21, A63F13/20, A63F13/213, G06F3/0354, G06F3/01 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/03547 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/218 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/24 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/214 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/285 (KR,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1037 (KR,US);
A63F2300/1043 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | A63F13/214, A63F13/218, A63F13/245, A63F13/24, A63F13/21, A63F13/20, A63F13/213 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG MIT SENSORISCHEN RICH-STEUERUNGEN | [2022/40] | English: | CONTROLLER WITH SENSOR-RICH CONTROLS | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE AVEC COMMANDES RICHES EN CAPTEURS | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015293617 (CLAYTON JOSEPH EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]DE212017000242U (NINGBO PREH JOYSON AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US10459542 (COSTANTE DIEGO RIVAS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 57 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 4 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 8 - column 5, line 32 * * column 6, line 19 - column 6, line 35 * * column 7, line 40 - column 7, line 51 * * claims 1,9 * | International search | [Y]US2012327025 (HUSKA ANDREW P [US], et al) [Y] 4-5, 11, 14, 19 * ; figures 3-8; paragraphs [0051, 0065-0067, 0077] *; | [Y]US2013038981 (IMANAKA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 2, 10 * ; abstract; paragraph [0012 & 0038] *; | [Y]US2013100021 (LARSEN ERIC J [US], et al) [Y] 15 * ; figures 3A & 6-7B; paragraph [0057-0058 & 0063] *; | [A]US2017239559 (IGARASHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21* ; entire document *; | [XY]US2019073036 (BERNSTEIN JEFFREY TRAER [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 6-9, 12-13, 16-18, 20-21 * ; abstract; figure 1-3, 8, 18 & 21; paragraphs [0052, 0063-0064, 0067, 0076-0077 & 0108-0111] * [Y] 2, 4-5, 10-11, 14-15, 19; | [A]US2019265834 (ROSENBERG ILYA DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US2019073036 | US10459542 |