EP4103563 - HETEROCYCLIC GLP-1 AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gasherbrum Bio, Inc. 2145 Clement St. San Francisco, California 94121 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Qinghua 5th Floor No. 1 South Bldg. 4560 JinKe Rd Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201210 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Xichen 5th Floor No. 1 South Bldg. 4560 JinKe Rd Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201210 / CN | 03 /
JENNINGS, Andrew 2145 Clement St. San Francisco, California 94121 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21753402.3 | 09.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021CN76260 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN75103 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/075103 | WO2020CN75105 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/075105 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160127 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103563 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D405/04, C07D401/04, A61K31/497, A61K31/4427, A61P3/10, A61P3/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (US);
A61K31/137 (US);
A61K31/155 (US);
A61K31/423 (US);
A61K31/497 (US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K38/1709 (US);
A61K38/26 (US);
A61K38/28 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE GLP-1-AGONISTEN | [2022/51] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC GLP-1 AGONISTS | [2022/51] | French: | AGONISTES HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES DE GLP-1 | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021112538 (HYUNDAI PHARM CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,5-23,25-32* the whole document; in particular the claims and examples; example 110 p.30; cAMP activity data p.82f * | International search | [A]CN110325530 (PFIZER) [A] 1-203 * see claims 1, 24; description, examples *; | [A]WO2019239371 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-203* see claims 1, 20; description, examples *; | [PX]WO2020103815 (QILU REGOR THERAPEUTICS INC [CN]) [PX] 1, 3-40, 57-125, 166-203 * see claims 1, 38-39; description, example 6 *; | [PX]WO2020207474 (QILU REGOR THERAPEUTICS INC [CN]) [PX] 1-203 * see claims 1, 21-22; description, example 4 *; | [PX]WO2020263695 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [PX] 2-30, 41-93, 102, 125-203 * see claims 1, 8; description, examples 3-6 *; | [PX]WO2021018023 (THE TITAN LEADING MED TECH INC [CN]) [PX] 1, 3-40, 57-125, 166-203 * see claims 1, 10; detailed description * |