EP4090099 - INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-TERRESTRIAL COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Yunfei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21753452.8 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021CN74508 | Priority number, date | CN20201094923 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010094923 | [2022/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021159976 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090099 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04W72/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN);
H04B7/1855 (US);
H04B7/088 (US);
H04B7/18513 (CN);
H04B7/18541 (EP);
H04L1/0061 (CN);
H04L1/1812 (CN);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04W72/046 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR NICHT TERRESTRISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2022/46] | English: | INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-TERRESTRIAL COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2022/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION D'INFORMATIONS POUR RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION NON TERRESTRE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | Translation filed | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2019215847 (ABDOLI JAVAD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-10,13-15 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] *[A] 5,6,11,12; | [YA]US2020052782 (WANG XIAO FENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-10,13-15 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0123] * [A] 5,6,11,12 | International search | [Y]CN109587789 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-4, 7-8, 15-18, 21-22, 29-31 * description, paragraphs 0029-0044, paragraphs 0147-0154 *; | [A]US2019149365 (CHATTERJEE DEBDEEP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * entire description *; | [A]CN109788497 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-31* entire description *; | [Y]CN110392427 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-4, 7-8, 15-18, 21-22, 29-31 * description, paragraphs 0023-0061, paragraph 0082 * | by applicant | CN20201094923 |