EP4054306 - UPWARD FACING LIGHT SENSOR FOR PLANT DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue River Technology Inc. 605 W California Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLGAN, Matthew, Stephen Blue River Technology Inc. 605 W. California Ave Sunnyvale, CA 94806 / US | 02 /
ROSS, Charles, Mccauley Blue River Technology Inc. 605 W. California Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94806 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd Suite 2.1 145 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5JF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd The Centrum Building 38 Queen Street Glasgow G1 3DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 21753713.3 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/37] | WO2021US17127 | Priority number, date | US202016789406 | 12.02.2020 Original published format: US202016789406 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021162998 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054306 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/02, A01C21/00, A01C15/00, A01C23/00 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G06Q50/02 (EP,US);
A01M7/0071 (EP,US);
G01N21/255 (US);
G01N21/84 (EP);
G06T7/0004 (US);
G06V10/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | NACH OBEN GERICHTETER LICHTSENSOR ZUR DETEKTION VON PFLANZEN | [2022/37] | English: | UPWARD FACING LIGHT SENSOR FOR PLANT DETECTION | [2022/37] | French: | CAPTEUR DE LUMIÈRE ORIENTÉ VERS LE HAUT POUR LA DÉTECTION DE PLANTES | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016144795 (BLUE RIVER TECH INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2007065857 (GLASER JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US2018330165 (HALLIGAN DEAGLAN [US], et al); | [YA]US2019150357 (WU DOLLY Y [US], et al); | [YA]US2019261581 (REDDEN LEE KAMP [US], et al); | [YA]US2019392239 (FERRARI LUCA [IT], et al) |