EP4105064 - CHARGING COMPARTMENT, CHARGING FRAME COMPRISING SAME, BATTERY SWAP STATION, AND ENERGY STORAGE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aulton New Energy Automotive Technology Group Block 1, Room 606, No. 1 Yichuang Street China-Singapore Guangzhou Knowledge City Huangpu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510700 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Dianba New Energy Technology Co., Ltd. No.4766 Jiangshan Road Building 1 Nicheng Town Pudong New Area Shanghai 201308 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAN, Zhibo 12th Floor, Building C5, No.2555 Xiupu Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201315 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Chunhua 12th Floor, Building C5, No.2555 Xiupu Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201315 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Hannke Bittner & Partner mbB Regensburg Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21753830.5 | 10.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021CN76573 | Priority number, date | CN20201093469 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010093469 | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160177 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105064 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/30, B60L53/80 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B60L53/80 (EP,CN);
B60L53/30 (EP,CN);
H02J7/0045 (US);
H01M50/244 (US);
H01M50/291 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | LADEFACH, LADERAHMEN DAMIT, BATTERIEWECHSELSTATION UND ENERGIESPEICHERSTATION | [2022/51] | English: | CHARGING COMPARTMENT, CHARGING FRAME COMPRISING SAME, BATTERY SWAP STATION, AND ENERGY STORAGE STATION | [2022/51] | French: | COMPARTIMENT DE CHARGE, CADRE DE CHARGE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI, STATION DE PERMUTATION DE BATTERIE ET STATION DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | Translation filed | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2463162 (CARBIKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]CN105480209 (SHANGHAI DIANBA NEW ENERGY RESOURCES SCI & TECH CO LTD) [Y] 2-6 * description paragraphs 35, 36, figures 1-4, 6 *; | [Y]CN107982826 (XIAN AEROSPACE PRECISION ELECTROMECHANICAL INST) [Y] 16-18 * description, paragraph 21 *; | [Y]CN108063194 (SHANGHAI DIANBA NEW ENERGY RESOURCES SCI & TECH CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 25-29, 32-37, figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN110254268 (BEIZI JINGGONG MACHINERY CHANGZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN110329218 (BOZHON PRECISION IND TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description paragraphs 31-37, 43, 44, figures 1-3 *; | [PX]CN111152676 (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 50-110, figures 1-12 *; | [PY]CN111152677 (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [PY] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 44-69, figures 1-10 *; | [PY]CN111169320 (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [PY] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 35-71, figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN111251918 (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 50-110, figures 1-12 *; | [E]CN212654225U (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [E] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 50-110, figures 1-12 *; | [E]CN212685267U (AULTON NEW ENERGY AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [E] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 50-110, figures 1-12 * | by applicant | CN20201093469 |