EP4188559 - SPRAY MODULE AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FIGHTING A VEGETATION FIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoze Solutions GmbH Steinstraße 6 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Martin Peter 8049 Zürich / CH | 02 /
ZENZ, David Johannes Reinhard 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21754711.6 | 20.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021EP70270 | Priority number, date | DE202010119754 | 27.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020119754 | [2023/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023124 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188559 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A62C99/00, A62C3/02 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A62C99/0072 (EP);
A62C3/02 (US);
A62C3/0292 (EP);
A62C31/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | SPRÜHMODUL SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG EINES VEGETATIONSBRANDS | [2023/23] | English: | SPRAY MODULE AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FIGHTING A VEGETATION FIRE | [2023/23] | French: | MODULE DE PULVÉRISATION ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE UN FEU DE VÉGÉTATION | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2620033 (COLLARD CATHERINE [FR]); | [XYI]US2008000649 (GUIRGUIS RASEM [AU], et al); | [A]US8118109 (HACKER CHRISTOPHER L [US]); | [A]US2016051848 (KLARLUND JACQUES [DK], et al) | by applicant | FR2603812 | DE69402099T | DE69319915T | DE202020103781U |