EP4188858 - STORING AND ISSUING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCA TECHNOLOGIES S.R.L. Via Statale, 17 10012 Bollengo (TO) / IT | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLECCHIA, Enrico 10012 Bollengo (TO) / IT | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | IP Sextant s.r.l. Via A. Salandra, n.18 00187 Rome / IT | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21754843.7 | 28.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021IB56862 | Priority number, date | IT20200018634 | 30.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018634 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023997 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188858 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4188858 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/00, B65H5/28 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B65H29/006 (EP);
G07F19/203 (US);
B65H5/28 (EP);
B65H2511/14 (EP);
B65H2511/18 (EP);
B65H2511/22 (EP);
B65H2701/1912 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/14, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 28.02.2023 | Title | German: | AUFBEWAHRUNGS- UND AUSGABEMODUL | [2023/23] | English: | STORING AND ISSUING MODULE | [2023/23] | French: | MODULE DE STOCKAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012164621 (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [A]US9514592 (MICHELS ANDRE [DE], et al); | [AD]EP3324369 (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP]) | by applicant | EP2104638 | WO2012164621 | EP3324369 |