EP4047486 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING OLAP PRE-COMPUTATION ENGINE ON BASIS OF OBJECT STORAGE, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUYUN (SHANGHAI) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Room 401, Block B, No. 112, Liangxiu Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 200120 / CN | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Danchao Shanghai 200120 / CN | 02 /
LI, Dong Shanghai 200120 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yang Shanghai 200120 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Qing Shanghai 200120 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services LLP Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21755674.5 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/34] | WO2021CN74311 | Priority number, date | CN202011544066 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011544066 | [2022/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022134269 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047486 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/172, G06F16/14, G06F16/13 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G06F16/13 (EP,CN);
G06F16/172 (CN);
G06F16/283 (US);
G06F16/148 (EP,CN);
G06F16/16 (EP,CN);
G06F16/162 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | G06F16/172, G06F16/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINES OLAP-VORRECHNERMOTORS AUF BASIS VON OBJEKTSPEICHERUNG UND ANWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/34] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING OLAP PRE-COMPUTATION ENGINE ON BASIS OF OBJECT STORAGE, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'UN MOTEUR DE PRÉ-CALCUL DE TRAITEMENT ANALYTIQUE EN LIGNE SUR LA BASE D'UN STOCKAGE D'OBJETS, ET SON APPLICATION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2021 | Translation filed | 26.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 04.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8645388 (BUECHE EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,4,6,8 ** column 2, lines 4-67 *; | [I] - Han Luke, "Announcing Kylin: Extreme OLAP Engine for Big Data", Internet, (20141020), URL: https://innovation.ebayinc.com/tech/engineering/announcing-kylin-extreme-olap-engine-for-big-data/, (20230919), XP093083581 [I] 1-15 * pages 1,4,5 * | International search | [Y]CN105701179 (NANJING STD CLOUD SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [Y] 7-16, 18, 20 * paragraphs 9-14 *; | [A]CN108140024 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]CN109756484 (HANGZHOU DTDREAM TECH CO LTD) [X] 17, 19, 20 * paragraphs 39-82, figures 1-19 * [Y] 1-10, 15, 20; | [Y]CN110099084 (BEIJING YIZHEN XUESI EDUCATION TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-16, 18, 20 * paragraph [51] *; | [Y]CN110275864 (WUHAN DEEPIN TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10, 16, 20 * paragraphs 55-91, figures 5-8 *; | [A]US10430389 (GUPTA NISHESH [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document * |