EP4107782 - MICROARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymer Forge, Inc. 504 S. Rosa Road Suite 200 Madison, WI 53719 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGESS, Daniel L. c/o: POLYMER FORGE, INC. 504 S. Rosa Road Suite 200 Madison, Wisconsin 53719 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21756368.3 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021US17026 | Priority number, date | US202062978597P | 19.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062978597 P | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167807 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107782 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, C12P19/34, C40B40/06, C40B40/10, B01J19/00, H01L33/00, // H01L33/50, H01L33/44, H01L33/58 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
C12P19/34 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B40/10 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (US);
H01L33/0095 (EP);
B01J2219/00315 (US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP);
B01J2219/00659 (EP);
B01J2219/00675 (EP);
B01J2219/00711 (EP);
B01J2219/00722 (EP);
B01J2219/00725 (EP);
B01J2219/00727 (EP);
B01J2219/00729 (EP);
B01J2219/00934 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H01L27/15, C12P19/34, C40B40/06, C40B40/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | MIKROARRAYS | [2022/52] | English: | MICROARRAYS | [2022/52] | French: | MICRORÉSEAUX | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005070009 (KLAPPROTH HOLGER [DE], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]CN101104954 (SUZHOU INST NANO TECH & NANO B [CN]) [I] 1-6,8,10-13,15* page 8 - page 9; figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2019165039 (KU TZU-KUN [TW], et al) [X] 1-9,11,14-16 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1A-K * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figures 2A, 2B * [I] 10,12,13 | International search | [Y]US2009270279 (SERAFINOWSKI PAWEL JERZY [GB], et al) [Y] 5, 12-13, 101-103* ; para [0113], [0134] *; | [XY]US2019165039 (KU TZU-KUN [TW], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-11, 14-37, 100 * ; abstract; para [0007], [0009], [0015], [0040]-[0042], [0045], [0047]-[0048], [0054], [0056]; claim 1 * [Y] 5,12-13, 101-103 |