EP4109811 - SECURE DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH QUANTUM-RANDOM-NUMBER-BASED QUANTUM ENCRYPTION CHIP AND SECURE COMMUNICATION SERVICE PROVISION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EYL Inc. Suite 401 52, Singu-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16971 / KR | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Bu Suk 38, Giheungdanji-ro 24beon-gil, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17086 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Dae Hyun 403-2703, 195, Mapo-daero, Mapo-gu Seoul 04129 / KR | 03 /
BAIK, Jung Hyun 103-1702, 219, Buljeong-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13608 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Seong Joon 133-803, 53, Junganggongwon-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13588 / KR | 05 /
SUH, Kang Won 202-2202, 10, Dongcheon-ro 63beon-gil, Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 16823 / KR | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Sander, Rolf, et al IPNY AB Birger Jarlsgaten 99A 11356 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 21756651.2 | 17.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021KR02002 | Priority number, date | KR20200018956 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200018956 | KR20200018957 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200018957 | KR20200018958 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200018958 | [2022/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167336 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109811 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04L9/14 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
H04L9/0852 (EP,US);
H04L9/0866 (EP);
H04L9/0869 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | SICHERE VORRICHTUNG MIT QUANTENZUFALLSZAHLEN-BASIERTEM QUANTENVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSCHIP UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES SICHEREN KOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTES UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/52] | English: | SECURE DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH QUANTUM-RANDOM-NUMBER-BASED QUANTUM ENCRYPTION CHIP AND SECURE COMMUNICATION SERVICE PROVISION METHOD USING SAME | [2022/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF SÉCURISÉ ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE PUCE DE CHIFFREMENT QUANTIQUE À BASE DE NOMBRES ALÉATOIRES QUANTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICE DE COMMUNICATION SÉCURISÉE L'UTILISANT | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | Translation filed | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2004100494 (CASPER TECHNOLOGY S R L [IT], et al); | [IY]EP2175579 (ADEYA SA [CH]); | [Y]KR101993885B (CHAE RYEONG [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2000013368 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]KR20080051947 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]); | [Y]KR20140054647 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20160121828 (AXSTONE CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20190034789 (EYL INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR101107241B |