EP4099574 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Shaoqing 9 Mo Zhou Dong Lu Jiangning Qu Nanjing, Jiangsu 211111 / CN | 02 /
WU, Zhikun Room 701 Citychamp Building, No. 12 Tai Yang Gong Zhong Lu Chao Yang District Beijing 100028 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Chen Room 701 Citychamp Building, No. 12 Tai Yang Gong Zhong Lu Chao Yang District Beijing 100028 / CN | 04 /
XU, Wei 9 Mo Zhou Dong Lu Jiangning Qu Nanjing, Jiangsu 211111 / CN | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21757878.0 | 10.02.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021CN76417 | Priority number, date | CN202010100127 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010100127 | [2022/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021164676 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099574 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06, // H04B1/10, H04B7/155 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04B7/04013 (EP);
H04B1/1036 (CN);
H04B7/145 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04B7/0695 (US);
H04B7/0696 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | H04B7/026, H04B7/145, // H04B1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2022/49] | H04B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/49] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2022 | Translation filed | 28.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN110225538 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA); | International search | [A]CN110012547 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0041]-[0074], figure 1 *; | [A]CN110266352 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A] - Taha Abdelrahman; Alrabeiah Muhammad; Alkhateeb Ahmed, "Enabling Large Intelligent Surfaces with Compressive Sensing and Deep Learning", IEEE Access, (20210304), vol. 9, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2021.3064073, pages 44304 - 44321, XP011845933 [A] 1-21 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2021.3064073 | [A] - Wu Qingqing; Zhang Rui, "Intelligent Reflecting Surface Enhanced Wireless Network via Joint Active and Passive Beamforming", IEEE Transactions on Wireless Communications, (20191101), vol. 18, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TWC.2019.2936025, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 5394 - 5409, XP011754367 [A] 1-21 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2019.2936025 |