EP4107189 - TISSUE TARGETED IMMUNOTOLERANCE WITH PD-1 AGONISTS OR IL-2 MUTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pandion Operations, Inc. 134 Coolidge Avenue 2nd Floor Watertown MA 02472 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINEY, Joanne L. 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 02 /
HIGGINSON-SCOTT, Nathan 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 03 /
OTIPOBY, Kevin 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 04 /
RIOS, Daniel 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 05 /
BORTHAKUR, Susmita 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 06 /
ALIOTO, Salvatore 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 07 /
EDWARDS, Lindsay 134 Coolidge Avenue, 2nd Floor Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21757890.5 | 19.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021US18698 | Priority number, date | US202062979859P | 21.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062979859 P | US202063092575P | 16.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063092575 P | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021168192 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4107189 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (US);
C07K14/70521 (EP);
C07K14/70596 (EP);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
C07K16/2833 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP);
C07K2317/524 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP);
C07K2317/75 (EP);
C07K2319/036 (US);
C07K2319/30 (EP);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | GEWEBEGEZIELTE IMMUNTOLERANZ MIT PD-1-AGONISTEN ODER IL-2-MUTEINEN | [2022/52] | English: | TISSUE TARGETED IMMUNOTOLERANCE WITH PD-1 AGONISTS OR IL-2 MUTEINS | [2022/52] | French: | IMMUNOTOLÉRANCE CIBLÉE SUR UN TISSU AVEC DES AGONISTES DE PD-1 OU DES MUTÉINES D'IL-2 | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011200601 (STANLEY JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US2018265584 (VINEY JOANNE L [US], et al); | [A]WO2019168745 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | International search | [A]US2010135948 (PAYNE AIMEE S [US], et al); | [A]US2011091449 (PAYNE AIMEE S [US], et al); | [A]US2016297888 (ZHOU HEYUE [US], et al); | [A]US2018340014 (VINEY JOANNE L [US], et al); | [A]WO2020014271 (SURROZEN INC [US]) |