EP4179664 - MEASUREMENT OF POWER LEVEL OF DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNAL PRIOR TO BLIND DECODING OF ASSOCIATED PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAHERZADEH BOROUJENI, Mahmoud San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21758483.8 | 07.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021US40730 | Priority number, date | US202063049779P | 09.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063049779 P | US202117368644 | 06.07.2021 Original published format: US202117368644 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022011038 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179664 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/0038 (EP);
H04L25/0238 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DES LEISTUNGSPEGELS EINES DEMODULATIONSREFERENZSIGNALS VOR DER BLINDDECODIERUNG EINES ZUGEHÖRIGEN PHYSIKALISCHEN DOWNLINK-STEUERKANALS | [2023/20] | English: | MEASUREMENT OF POWER LEVEL OF DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNAL PRIOR TO BLIND DECODING OF ASSOCIATED PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL | [2023/20] | French: | MESURE DU NIVEAU DE PUISSANCE D'UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE DÉMODULATION AVANT UN DÉCODAGE AVEUGLE D'UN CANAL PHYSIQUE DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE ASSOCIÉ | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2015038043 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [XAY]CN109660315 (BEIJING SPREADTRUM HIGH TECH COMMUNICATIONS TECH CO LTD); | [Y]US2019334681 (XU HUILIN [US], et al); | [A]US10644914 (MEDLES ABDELKADER [GB], et al) |