EP4193747 - WIRELESS DEVICE PAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ofinno, LLC 1950 Opportunity Way, Suite 1200 Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/24] | For all designated states Ofinno, LLC 11091 Sunset Hills Road, Suite 510 Reston, VA 20190 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Taehun Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 02 /
DINAN, Esmael Hejazi Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 03 /
JEON, Hyoungsuk Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 04 /
PARK, Kyungmin Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 05 /
RYU, Jinsook Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 06 /
TALEBI FARD, Peyman Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21758967.0 | 03.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021US44365 | Priority number, date | US202063062326P | 06.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063062326 P | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031718 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193747 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04W72/0446 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | FUNKRUF EINER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | WIRELESS DEVICE PAGING | [2023/24] | French: | RADIOMESSAGERIE DE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0028686 (GLENAYRE ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [I]EP2076089 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [I]CN103687019 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH); | [A]US2014302872 (LANE FRANK [US], et al); | [A]US2017094660 (FREDERIKSEN FRANK [DK], et al); | [A]US2018098228 (SCHMIDT ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2019021058 (CHENG YU-HSIN [TW], et al) |