EP4188349 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THYMOL AND AMINO ACIDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY OR FUNCTIONAL INTESTINAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vetagro International S.r.l. Via Ignazio Porro 2 42124 Reggio Emilia (RE) / IT | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIVA, Andrea 42124 Reggio nell'Emilia / IT | 02 /
GRILLI, Ester 42124 Reggio nell'Emilia / IT | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Benedetto, Marco Marben S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21759132.0 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021IB56723 | Priority number, date | IT20200018913 | 31.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018913 | [2023/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023932 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188349 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/055, A23K20/142, A23K20/158, A23K50/30, A23L33/175, A61K9/16, A61K31/198, A61K31/405, A61P1/00, A61P1/06, A61P1/08, A61P1/10, A61P1/12, A61P1/14 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61K31/05 (US);
A23K10/30 (US);
A23K20/105 (EP);
A23K20/111 (EP);
A23K20/142 (EP);
A23K50/30 (EP);
A23K50/60 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP);
A23K50/80 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61K31/055 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0056 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61K9/1664 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/055, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/405, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT THYMOL UND AMINOSÄUREN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ODER FUNKTIONELLEN DARMERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/23] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THYMOL AND AMINO ACIDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY OR FUNCTIONAL INTESTINAL DISORDERS | [2023/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DU THYMOL ET DES ACIDES AMINÉS POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES INTESTINAUX INFLAMMATOIRES OU FONCTIONNELS | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 02.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013323352 (MERCIER YVES [FR], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * page 1, paragraphs [0008], [0012]-[0015], [0019], [0027] * * page 2, paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0035]-[0039], [0056] * * claims 1, 4-5, 15 *; | [Y]WO2018089516 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph [0005]; claims 1-3, 8-10 * * page 5, paragraph [0023] * * pages 12-13; example 2 *; | [Y]CN111406835 (UNIV FOSHAN) [Y] 1-9 * example 5 * * claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]WO2020146587 (NOVUS INT INC [US]) [Y] 9 * pages 23-24, paragraph [0080] * * page 32; example 1 * * claims 1, 5, 9, 11, 13, 14, 20, 21 *; | [XP]WO2021019510 (VETAGRO INT S R L [IT]) [XP] 1-7,9 * page 9, lines 29-32 * * pages 27-29; example - * * claims 1-16 *; | [XP]WO2021019506 (VETAGRO INT S R L [IT]) [XP] 1-7,9 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * pages 30-32; example - ** claims 1-16 *; | [A] - DU ENCUN ET AL, "Effects of thymol and carvacrol supplementation on intestinal integrity and immune responses of broiler chickens challenged with Clostridium perfringens", vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40104-016-0079-7, (20161201), JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, URL: https://jasbsci.biomedcentral.com/track/pdf/10.1186/s40104-016-0079-7.pdf, XP055810404 [A] 1-4,9 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3; table 2 * * page 6, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 9, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40104-016-0079-7 | [Y] - Pourya Tahmasebi ET AL, "Thymol has beneficial effects on the experimental model of ulcerative colitis", Avicenna journal of phytomedicine, doi:10.22038/AJP.2019.13383, (20191101), pages 538 - 550, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6823534/pdf/AJP-9-538.pdf, XP055762265 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.22038/AJP.2019.13383 | [Y] - FAITH A. OMONIJO ET AL, "Development of Novel Microparticles for Effective Delivery of Thymol and Lauric Acid to Pig Intestinal Tract", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, US, (20180824), vol. 66, no. 37, doi:10.1021/acs.jafc.8b02808, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 9608 - 9615, XP055652012 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 9609, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 9609, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 9611, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 9612; figure 5 * * page 9612, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jafc.8b02808 | [Y] - JANGHAN CHOI ET AL, "Evaluation of lipid matrix microencapsulation for intestinal delivery of thymol in weaned pigs", TRANSLATIONAL ANIMAL SCIENCE, (20191122), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1093/tas/txz176, pages 411 - 422, XP055762300 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * Materials; page 412 * * page 415; table 2 * * page 419, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 419, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/tas/txz176 | [Y] - LIU YULAN ET AL, "Roles of amino acids in preventing and treating intestinal diseases: recent studies with pig models", AMINO ACIDS, SPRINGER VERLAG, AU, vol. 49, no. 8, doi:10.1007/S00726-017-2450-1, ISSN 0939-4451, (20170614), pages 1277 - 1291, (20170614), XP037121510 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1278, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1281, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1285, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1285, column 2, paragraph l - page 1286, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1286, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 1287, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00726-017-2450-1 | [Y] - ZHANG BEIBEI ET AL, "Dietary L-arginine inhibits intestinal Clostridium perfringens colonisation and attenuates intestinal mucosal injury in broiler chickens", vol. 118, no. 5, doi:10.1017/S0007114517002094, ISSN 0007-1145, (20170913), pages 321 - 332, BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, URL: https://www.cambridge.org/core/journals/british-journal-of-nutrition/article/dietary-larginine-inhibits-intestinal-clostridium-perfringens-colonisation-and-attenuates-intestinal-mucosal-injury-in-broiler-chickens/4C025930CA1940D794FBF7D20395D1E6, XP055810405 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 321, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 321, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 322, column 1 * * page 330, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114517002094 |