EP4196691 - SCREW FOR WOOD, WOOD-BASED MATERIALS AND WOOD-LIKE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWG Schraubenwerk Gaisbach GmbH Am Bahnhof 50 74638 Waldenburg / DE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLL, Patrick 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 02 /
GLATTBACH, Joachim 74629 Pfedelbach / DE | 03 /
GEIGER, Andrej 74544 Michelbach an der Bilz / DE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21759273.2 | 09.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP72128 | Priority number, date | DE202010210174 | 11.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020210174 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022034004 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196691 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00, F16B25/10, F16B35/06 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
F16B35/065 (EP);
F16B25/0015 (EP);
F16B25/0057 (EP);
F16B25/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | SCHRAUBE FÜR HOLZ, HOLZWERKSTOFFE UND HOLZÄHNLICHE MATERIALIEN | [2023/25] | English: | SCREW FOR WOOD, WOOD-BASED MATERIALS AND WOOD-LIKE MATERIALS | [2023/25] | French: | VIS POUR BOIS, MATÉRIAUX À BASE DE BOIS ET MATÉRIAUX DE TYPE BOIS | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB190615102 (MILLER JOHN EDWARD) [A] 8-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE29811536U (BIERBACH GMBH & CO KG BEFESTIG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,15 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2002295429 (DANDORI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 14,15* figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE202007018179U (REISSER SCHRAUBENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2011164944 (HUGHES BARRY J [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * [I] 4,8-15 |