EP4179415 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRESENTING AN INTERACTIVE MAP DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Troutwood, LLC 467 Troutwood Dr. Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATALI, Eugene M. Jr. Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 02 /
DAVIDEK, Jeffrey Richard Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Dorian Pittsburgh, PA 15210 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Brian G. Chicago, IL 60654 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21759496.9 | 20.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021US70912 | Priority number, date | US202063053914P | 20.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063053914 P | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022020846 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179415 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G01C21/36, G06F3/0484, G06F16/29, G06F16/44, G09B29/10, H04W4/021 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G01C21/3667 (US);
G06F16/9537 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G09B29/007 (EP);
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04L63/02 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINER INTERAKTIVEN KARTENANZEIGE | [2023/20] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRESENTING AN INTERACTIVE MAP DISPLAY | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉSENTATION D'UN AFFICHAGE DE CARTE INTERACTIVE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 08.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2001030667 (KELTS BRETT R [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0226] * * figures 1-20 *; | [I]WO2011020101 (TELOGIS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2012162399 (VISIBLE MARKET INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0120] ** figures 1-21 *; | [XI]WO2018201104 (SNAP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15-17 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0277] * * figures 1-17 * [I] 4-14 |