EP4110760 - GPR40 AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kallyope, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, 10th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEBHAT, Iyassu 430 East 29th Street 10th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | 02 /
HE, Shuwen 430 East 29th Street 10th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | 03 /
MATHIEU, Simon 430 East 29th Street 10th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21759537.0 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19973 | Priority number, date | US202062983438P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062983438 P | US202063076113P | 09.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076113 P | US202063117074P | 23.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063117074 P | US202163147982P | 10.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163147982 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174046 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110760 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/64, C07D241/12, C07F5/04, C07F9/30, C07F9/58, C07F9/6509, C07F9/6558, A61K31/155, A61K31/4418, A61K31/662, A61K31/675, A61K45/06, A61P3/00, A61P1/16 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
C07F9/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61K31/4418 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D241/12 (EP);
C07F9/306 (EP,US);
C07F9/650952 (EP);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4418, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/662, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/01] | C07D213/64, C07F9/38, C07F9/32, A61K31/4418, A61K31/675, A61K31/662, A61P3/00, A61P1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | GPR40-AGONISTEN | [2023/01] | English: | GPR40 AGONISTS | [2023/01] | French: | AGONISTES DE GPR40 | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012011125 (CONNEXIOS LIFE SCIENCES PVT LTD [IN], et al); | [X]US2015018422 (MIWATASHI SEIJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2016009662 (MEEGALLA SANATH [US], et al); | [X]US2016332968 (CHOBANIAN HARRY [US], et al); |