EP4112802 - CLOTHING TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | For all designated states Seoul National University R & DB Foundation Kwanak-ro 1 Kwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Taewoong IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
JUN, Chaseung IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Sangwook IP center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
SUL, Seungki 107-802 Nambu sunhwan-ro 2311-12 Seocho-gu Seoul 06714 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Joohyun 905-101 Mokryun Shin dong-a Apt. Dongan-ro 75 Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14074 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hwigon 9283 Insil-gil, Gaya-eup Haman-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52053 / KR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21759901.8 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021KR02515 | Priority number, date | KR20200025604 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200025604 | [2023/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172959 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112802 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/04, D06F58/26, D06F58/40, D06F34/26, D06F34/10, H05B6/10 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
D06F34/20 (EP);
D06F39/04 (EP,KR);
D06F34/10 (KR);
D06F34/26 (KR);
D06F58/26 (EP,KR);
D06F58/40 (KR);
H05B6/06 (EP);
H05B6/10 (EP,KR);
D06F2103/44 (EP);
D06F2103/52 (EP);
D06F2105/28 (EP);
D06F23/02 (EP);
D06F25/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KLEIDUNG | [2023/01] | English: | CLOTHING TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2023/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE VÊTEMENTS | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2022 | Translation filed | 28.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 19.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0646620U ; | [A]US2019264371 (JANG JAEHYUK [KR], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH0646620U (ZOJIRUSHI CORP.) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0007] and [0011] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US5564831 (BASHARK LARRY T [US]) [A] 1-15* See claims 4-5 and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR20110025469 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7-8 * See paragraphs [0021] and [0029] and figures 2 and 4. *; | [Y]JP2011067309 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 12 * See paragraph [0025] and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20190101749 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0022], [0026], [0028], [0030]-[0031] and [0051]-[0052] and figures 1-5. * | by applicant | US2018148886 |