EP4111265 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAFETY-ENABLED CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fort Robotics, Inc. 170 S. Independence Mall W Suite 275W Philadelphia PA 19106 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIVANS, Nathan 170 S. Independence Mall W, Suite 275W Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | 02 /
DIMACHKIE, Walid 170 S. Independence Mall W, Suite 275W Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21759933.1 | 23.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19268 | Priority number, date | US202062982615P | 27.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062982615 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173570 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111265 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02, // G05B13/02 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP);
G05B9/03 (US);
G05B13/0265 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | G05B9/00, G05B19/048, G05B19/406 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERHEITSAKTIVIERTEN STEUERUNG | [2023/01] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAFETY-ENABLED CONTROL | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR COMMANDE À SÉCURITÉ ACTIVÉE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010250023 (GUDAT ADAM JOHN [US]); | [A]US2015198936 (MCGEE ROBERT JASON [US], et al); | [A]JP2019021200 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA) | International search | [A]US2016282845 (TODA SHUNTARO [JP], et al); | [A]US2019078429 (ZHENG SHUNFENG [US], et al); | [A]US2019143965 (DRISCOLL JOSEPH [US], et al) |