EP4112666 - HIGH-MOLECULAR-WEIGHT ACRYLIC TRIBLOCK COPOLYMER AND PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASAKI, Tomoe c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Tomohiro c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21760140.0 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021JP06990 | Priority number, date | JP20200032767 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020032767 | [2023/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172398 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112666 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08F293/00, C09J153/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
C08F293/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/1802 (US);
C09J133/08 (US);
C09J153/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | HOCHMOLEKULARES ACRYLTRIBLOCKCOPOLYMER UND DIESES ENTHALTENDE DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/01] | English: | HIGH-MOLECULAR-WEIGHT ACRYLIC TRIBLOCK COPOLYMER AND PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2023/01] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE ACRYLIQUE TRIBLOC À POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE ÉLEVÉ ET COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION LE CONTENANT | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2022 | Translation filed | 08.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004097658 (EVERAERTS ALBERT I [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * Comparative examples C6-C9; paragraphs [0001] , [ 0116] , [ 0124] - [0131] - [ 0144] - [0150]; examples 1-4,6-7,33-37; tables 1-2,10-11 *; | [X]US2004202881 (EVERAERTS ALBERT I [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0129] , [ 0146] - [0153] - [ 0186] , [ 0192] , [ 0194]; examples 1B, 1C, 1G, 1H, 9D, 9E, 12A-12D, 13A, 13B; claim -; tables 2,9,10,15-18 *; | [X]EP2348085 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0118] , [ 0156] , [ 0159] , [ 0160]; examples 1B, 1C, 1G, 1H, 9D, 9E, 12A-12D, 13A, 13B; claim -; tables 2,9,10,15-18 *; | [A]US2014107282 (TRAN THU-VAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0002] , [ 0164] - paragraph [0166]; claim - * | International search | [A]JP2015520774 (KURARAY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-3 * , claims, examples *; | [A]JP2016000771 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-3* , claims, examples *; | [A]WO2017014154 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * , claims, examples *; | [X]JP2018039941 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1-3 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0003], [0132]-[0141], synthesis example 3, example 9 * | by applicant | WO2007029783 | JP2016044203 |