EP4110780 - 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLE DERIVATIVE COMPOUNDS AS HISTONE DEACETYLASE 6 INHIBITOR, AND THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chong Kun Dang Pharmaceutical Corp. 8, Chungjeong-ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03742 / KR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chang Kon 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | 02 /
KO, Moo Sung 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | 03 /
GWAK, Dal-Yong 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | 04 /
YUN, Seok Hyoun 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Seo Young 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hyunjin Michael 315-20, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16995 / KR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/32] |
Former [2023/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21760387.7 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021KR02362 | Priority number, date | KR20200023249 | 25.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200023249 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172886 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110780 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4110780 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/4545, A61K31/496, A61P25/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | C07D471/04, A61K31/4545, A61K31/496, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/00, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1,3,4OXADIAZOLDERIVATVERBINDUNGEN ALS HISTONDEACETYLASE-6-HEMMER UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2023/01] | English: | 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLE DERIVATIVE COMPOUNDS AS HISTONE DEACETYLASE 6 INHIBITOR, AND THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2023/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS DÉRIVÉS DE 1,3,4-OXADIAZOLE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE 6, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE LES COMPRENANT | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009002534 (GILEAD COLORADO INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2017030938 (INCYTE CORP [US]); | [A]WO2017222950 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2010120761 (BERDINI VALERIO [GB], et al); | [A]WO2011038086 (AMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]KR20120034635 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]US2018230113 (LEE JAEKWANG [KR], et al); |