EP4111291 - HAND GESTURE INPUT FOR WEARABLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACEY, Paul c/o Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 21761499.9 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19677 | Priority number, date | US202062981934P | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981934 P | US202063027272P | 19.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027272 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173839 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111291 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00, G06T19/20, G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G06V20/10, G06V40/20, G06V40/10 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06V20/10 (EP);
G06V40/107 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | G06F3/00, G06T19/00, G06T19/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | HANDGESTENEINGABE FÜR EIN TRAGBARES SYSTEM | [2023/01] | English: | HAND GESTURE INPUT FOR WEARABLE SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | INTERVENTION PAR GESTE DE LA MAIN POUR SYSTÈME TECHNOVESTIMENTAIRE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2872967 (SOFTKINETIC SOFTWARE [BE]); | [XI]WO2019032967 (GOOGLE LLC [US]); | [A]US10296102 (MISRA MARLON [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2014201674 (HOLZ DAVID [US]); | [A]US2017315615 (COOK GREGORY WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2019108676 (HOLZ DAVID [US]); | [A]US2019355180 (POWDERLY JAMES M [US], et al); | by applicant | EP2872967 | WO2019032967 | US2019362557 |