EP4188545 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING DAMAGED EPITHELIAL SURFACES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SerEye GmbH Rudolf-Wissell-Str. 28a 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADLER, Herbert 37127 Niemetal-Ellershausen / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Stefan 37085 Göttingen / DE | 03 /
JOCHHEIM-RICHTER, Andrea 61462 Königstein im Taunus / DE | 04 /
SILLABER, Ingeborg 80802 München / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21761982.4 | 03.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021EP71638 | Priority number, date | EP20200189093 | 03.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20189093 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029109 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188545 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4188545 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/02, G01N33/49 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A61P27/02 (EP,US);
A61K35/16 (US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BESCHÄDIGTEN EPITHELOBERFLÄCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/31] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATING DAMAGED EPITHELIAL SURFACES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME | [2023/23] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES SURFACES ÉPITHÉLIALES ENDOMMAGÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/31] |
Former [2023/23] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BESCHÄDIGTEN EPITHELOBERFLÄCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2023/23] | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES ÉPITHÉLIALES ENDOMMAGÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 31.01.2024 | |
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 30.04.2024 | |
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006127874 (SATO SAKAE [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0015] , [ 0025] , [ 0026] *; | [A]US2018050064 (SCHROTT MARC [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022]; claims 1-3,6-12 *; | [XYI] - SORENSEN O ET AL, "The human antibacterial cathelicidin, hCAP-18, is bound to lipoproteins in plasma", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19990806), vol. 274, no. 32, doi:10.1074/JBC.274.32.22445, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22445 - 22451, XP002257545 [X] 1,3,4,9 * page 22448; table 1 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.32.22445 | [XYI] - BOZIC ET AL, "Viscosity of Plasma as a Key Factor in Assessment of Extracellular Vesicles by Light Scattering", CELLS, (20190906), vol. 8, no. 9, doi:10.3390/cells8091046, page 1046, XP055768217 [X] 1-4,7,9 * Material and Methods; pages 3, 4, 12; figure 6 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/cells8091046 | by applicant | US7592134 | WO2018229718 | - FOX et al., Arthritis Rheum, (19840000), vol. 27, pages 459 - 461 | - GONZALEZ-ANDRADES et al., Sci Rep, (20160000), vol. 6, page 38143 | - PETZNICK et al., Eye, (20130000), vol. 27, pages 1102 - 1114 | - ALIO et al., J Ophthalmol., (20170000), page 2457620 | - DOGRU et al., Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci, (20180000), vol. 59, pages DES163 - DES168 | - CERVELATTI et al., Free Radical Research, (20140000), vol. 48, pages 303 - 312 | - TERASHINI et al., Investigative Ophthalmology & Visual Science, (20080000), vol. 49, pages 2432 - 2437 | - PFLUGFELDERPAIVA, Ophthalmology, (20170000), vol. 124, pages S4 - S13 | - BAUDOUIN et al., Acta Ophthalmologica, (20180000), vol. 96, pages 111 - 119 | - KAUPPINEN et al., Cell. Mol. Life Sci., (20160000), vol. 73, pages 1765 - 1786 | - RODA et al., Int. J. Mol. Sci., (20200000), vol. 21, page 3111 | - ZHENG et al., J. Cell Physiol., (20100000), vol. 222, pages 95 - 102 | - LI et al., Exp. Eye Res., (20010000), vol. 73, pages 449 - 459 | - JUNTERLEBRUN, Rev Environ Sci Biotechnol, (20170000), vol. 16, pages 455 - 489 | - BRYANTKLEIN, Arch Pathol Lab Med, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 719 - 733 | - BURNOUFRADOSEVICH, Haemophilia, (20030000), vol. 9, pages 24 - 37 | - KO et al., Analyst., (20160000), vol. 141, pages 450 - 460 | - GEERLING et al., British Journal of Ophthalmology, (20040000), vol. 88, pages 467 - 1474 | - RATAY et al., Advanced Healthcare Materials, (20170000), vol. 6 | - TUCK et al., J Proteome Res., (20090000), vol. 8, pages 113 - 117 | - MAUGERI et al., Peptides, (20180000), vol. 99, pages 20 - 26 | - SCHICHT et al., Scientific Reports, (20180000), vol. 8, page 9791 | - LIANG et al., Molecular vision, (20120000), vol. 18, pages 2195 - 2204 | - ZELENKASMITH, Expert Opinion on Therapeutic Patents, (20050000), vol. 15, pages 875 - 887 | - ROBCIUC et al., Eye (London, England, (20180000), vol. 32, pages 813 - 819 | - WU et al., International journal of ophthalmology, (20170000), vol. 10, pages 908 - 913 | - ARAKI-SASAKI et al., Investigative ophthalmology & visual science, (19950000), vol. 36, pages 614 - 621 | - WUYOTNA, Journal of Visualized Experiments, (20110000), vol. 54, page e289 | - HO J.H-C. et al., Br. J. Opthalmol., (20080000), vol. 92, pages 992 - 997 |