EP4192371 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TREATING A STRICTURE ALONG THE BILIARY AND/OR PANCREATIC TRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESSLER, III, Raymond D. Roberts, Wisconsin 54023 / US | 02 /
DAYTON, Peter L. Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | 03 /
JODA, David B. St. Paul, Minnesota 55119 / US | 04 /
LEMKE, Kyle L. Hudson, Wisconsin 54016 / US | 05 /
KOMANDURI, Srinadh Downers Grove, Illinois 60515 / US | 06 /
GALLUCCI, JR., Vincent Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 07 /
MATTESON, Jason Beldenville, Wisconsin 54003 / US | 08 /
OLSON, Mark P. New Brigton, Minnesota 55112 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21762227.3 | 03.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021US44420 | Priority number, date | US202063061451P | 05.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063061451 P | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031763 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192371 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B1/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP,KR);
A61M29/00 (US);
A61B1/012 (EP,KR);
A61M25/0082 (US);
A61M25/0147 (US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00323 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00991 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/22038 (EP);
A61B2090/062 (EP);
A61B2090/0811 (EP);
A61M2210/1042 (US);
A61M2210/1071 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER VERENGUNG ENTLANG DES GALLEN- UND/ODER PANKREASTRAKTES | [2023/24] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TREATING A STRICTURE ALONG THE BILIARY AND/OR PANCREATIC TRACT | [2023/24] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE STÉNOSE LE LONG DES VOIES BILIAIRES ET/OU PANCRÉATIQUES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9712557 (KELLEHER BRIAN S [US]); | [Y]US6126633 (KAJI KUNIHIDE [JP], et al); | [A]US2008183175 (SAAL JEFFREY ALAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2014005478 (KENNEDY II KENNETH C [US], et al); | [A]US2015012008 (MCWEENEY JOHN O [US]); | [Y]US2016361088 (MAGUIRE MARK A [US], et al); | [A]US2020221926 (PETERSEN LASSE KJELD GJOESKE [DK], et al) |