EP4200951 - OPERATING AN ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTZ, Peter 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21762394.1 | 09.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP72117 | Priority number, date | EP20200201333 | 12.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20201333 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022078652 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200951 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10, C25B15/08 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H02J1/106 (EP);
C25B15/06 (US);
C25B1/34 (US);
C25B15/02 (EP);
C25B15/023 (US);
C25B9/65 (US);
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B1/23 (EP);
C25B9/23 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | BETREIBEN EINER ELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/26] | English: | OPERATING AN ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE | [2023/26] | French: | FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROLYSE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1046587 (ORONZIO DE NORA IMPIANTI) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 2-9; | [A]DE19637656 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 7 *; | [A]DE102014224013 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0027] , [0037] , [0058] , [0061] * | by applicant | DE19729429 |