EP4193118 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING A TUBULAR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | 06.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PYROALLIANCE 139, route de Verneuil B.P. 52 78130 Les Mureaux / FR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEANNEAU, Olivier 33185 LE HAILLAN / FR | 02 /
BAILLEUL, Romain 78955 CARRIERES SOUS POISSY / FR | 03 /
VIAIRON, Bruno 78540 VERNOUILLET / FR | 04 /
DAURELLE, Fabien 83500 LA SEYNE SUR MER / FR | 05 /
FORYS, Christian 95430 AUVERS SUR OISE / FR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21762754.6 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021FR51447 | Priority number, date | FR20200008300 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: FR 2008300 | [2023/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029391 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193118 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F42D3/00, F42B1/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
F42B1/02 (EP,IL);
F42D3/00 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINER ROHRFÖRMIGEN STRUKTUR | [2023/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR CUTTING A TUBULAR STRUCTURE | [2023/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DECOUPE D'UNE STRUCTURE TUBULAIRE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8700717U (.) [A] 1 * the whole document ** figure 2 *; | [A]US4724105 (OWEN HARROLD D [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2004206265 (BELL WILLIAM T [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document * * paragraph [0054] *; | [XI]US2016130902 (WRIGHT DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0038] * [I] 5 | by applicant | FR2491387 |