EP4196906 - AUTOMATED IDENTIFICATION OF NECROTIC REGIONS IN DIGITAL IMAGES OF MULTIPLEX IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE STAINED TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 E. Innovation Park Drive Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Jessica Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 02 /
KHOJASTEH, Mehrnoush Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 03 /
SHEIKHZADEH, Fahime Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 04 /
SOM, Anirudh Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | 05 /
TAIEB, Aicha Beya Ben Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21762969.0 | 11.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021US45507 | Priority number, date | US202063065350P | 13.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063065350 P | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022035943 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196906 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G06V20/69 (EP);
G06F18/2414 (EP);
G06V10/449 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE IDENTIFIZIERUNG NEKROTISCHER REGIONEN IN DIGITALEN BILDERN VON MULTIPLEX-IMMUNOFLUORESZENZ-GEFÄRBTEM GEWEBE | [2023/25] | English: | AUTOMATED IDENTIFICATION OF NECROTIC REGIONS IN DIGITAL IMAGES OF MULTIPLEX IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE STAINED TISSUE | [2023/25] | French: | IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATISÉE DE RÉGIONS NÉCROTIQUES DANS DES IMAGES NUMÉRIQUES DE TISSU MARQUÉ PAR IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE MULTIPLEX | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 01.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |