EP4192982 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DETECTION OF SEVERE ACUTE RESPIRATORY SYNDROME CORONAVIRUS 2 (SARS-2), INFLUENZA A, AND INFLUENZA B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Renjian R H Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 02 /
SUN, Jingtao Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Hövelmann, Sascha Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPMM.....6164) Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21763241.3 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP71733 | Priority number, date | US202063062105P | 06.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063062105 P | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022029157 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4192982 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON SCHWEREM AKUTEM RESPIRATORISCHEM SYNDROM CORONAVIRUS 2 (SARS-2), INFLUENZA A UND INFLUENZA B | [2023/24] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DETECTION OF SEVERE ACUTE RESPIRATORY SYNDROME CORONAVIRUS 2 (SARS-2), INFLUENZA A, AND INFLUENZA B | [2023/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTECTER LE CORONAVIRUS 2 DU SYNDROME RESPIRATOIRE AIGU SÉVÈRE (SARS-2), DE LA GRIPPE A ET DE LA GRIPPE B | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN111074005 (XI AN BORICARE CORNING BIOMEDICAL CENTER CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * sequence 13 *; | [A]CN111118226 (BEIJING WEIWEILAI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * sequence 98 *; | [I]CN111118228 (SHANGHAI BANGXIAN MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-19 * sequence 4 *; | [A]CN111189900 (UNIV YUNNAN) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]CN111197112 (GUANGZHOU ANBIPING MEDICINE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,6-9 *; | [A]CN111218501 (XINYI MANUFACTURING TECH BEIJING CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 1; example 1; table 1 *; | [A]CN111334609 (ZHENGZHOU CHILDRENS HOSPITAL OF HENAN CHILDRENS HOSPITAL) [A] 1-19 * claims 1, 3 *; | [A]CN111334608 (BEIJING YISEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]CN111349719 (THE FIRST AFFILIATED HOSPITAL OF GUANGZHOU MEDICAL UNIV GUANGZHOU RESPIRATORY CENTER, et al) [A] 1-19 * n_CoV-2019_44 *; | [A]CN111378789 (GUANGZHOU HYBRIBIO PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]CN111394522 (SANSURE BIOTECH INC) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-4; sequence 29 *; | [I]CN111394519 (NANJING PRACTICE MEDICINE EXAMINATION CO LTD) [I] 1-19 * 2019-nCoV-ORF1ab-R *; | [A]CN111394513 (INST PATHOGEN BIOLOGY CAMS) [A] 1-19 * sequence 6 *; | [I]CN111394518 (CHENGDU YINTAI LIFE TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-19* sequence 4 *; | [A]RU2727054 (DROZD SERGEJ FELIKSOVICH [RU]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]CN111454943 (PILOT GENE TECH HANGZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * claim 1; sequence 2 *; | [E]WO2021168478 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 1-19 * claims 1-5 *; | [E]WO2021180631 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [E] 1-19 * claim 1; sequences 1,9,18,27-31,39 *; | [E]WO2021243333 (BIOHSV HOLDINGS INC [US]) [E] 1 * sequence 116 *; | [E]WO2022025823 (LUCENCE LIFE SCIENCES PTE LTD [SG]) [E] 1 * sequence 507 *; | [A] - Ranoa Diana Rose E. ET AL, "Saliva-Based Molecular Testing for SARS-CoV-2 that Bypasses RNA Extraction", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/2020.06.18.159434, (20200618), pages 1 - 35, URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/2020.06.18.159434v1.full.pdf, (20210813), XP055832042 [A] 1-19 * page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/2020.06.18.159434 | [A] - LAI CHIH-CHENG ET AL, "In vitro diagnostics of coronavirus disease 2019: Technologies and application", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, IMMUNOLOGY AND INFECTION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JMII.2020.05.016, ISSN 1684-1182, (20200605), pages 164 - 174, (20200605), XP086549959 [A] 1-19 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmii.2020.05.016 | [A] - N N, "Novel Coronavirus (SARS-CoV-2) Real-Time Multiplex RT-PCR Kit", Liferiver, (20200409), URL: https://www.who.int/diagnostics_laboratory/eual/eul_0486_139_00_novel_coronavirus_sars_cov_2_real_time_multiplex_rt_pcr_kit_ifu.pdf, XP055825772 [A] 1-19 * page 12 * | [AP] - Li Tao ET AL, "Rapid High Throughput Whole Genome Sequencing of SARS-CoV-2 by using One-step RT-PCR Amplification with Integrated Microfluidic System and Next-Gen Sequencing", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/2020.11.04.369165, (20201105), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/2020.11.04.369165v1.full.pdf, (20211202), XP055868686 [AP] 1-19 * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/2020.11.04.369165 | [I] - Zhao Zhen ET AL, "Abstract", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/2020.02.22.961268, (20200227), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/2020.02.22.961268v1.full.pdf, (20210210), XP055774509 [I] 1-19 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/2020.02.22.961268 | by applicant | WO8403285 | US4996143 | US5210015 | US5565322 | US5849489 | US5994056 | US6001611 | US6162603 | US6171785 | US6184379 | US6748617 | US6780617 | US2010056383 | US7718421 | US7741467 | US10774393 | - LU, R. et al., Lancet, (20200000), vol. 395, pages 565 - 574 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. MN9089470 | - ALTSCHUL et al., "Basic local alignment search tool", J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - GISH et al., "Identification of protein coding regions by database similarity search", Nature Genet, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272 | - MADDEN et al., "Applications of network BLAST server", Meth. Enzymol., (19960000), vol. 266, doi:10.1016/S0076-6879(96)66011-X, pages 131 - 141, XP001006313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(96)66011-X | - ALTSCHUL et al., "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", Nucleic Acids Res, (19970000), vol. 25, doi:10.1093/nar/25.17.3389, pages 3389 - 3402, XP002905950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.17.3389 | - ZHANG et al., "PowerBLAST: A new network BLAST application for interactive or automated sequence analysis and annotation", Genome Res, (19970000), vol. 7, pages 649 - 656 |