EP4196325 - PLANT FOR PRODUCING A, PREFERABLY FLAT, CONCRETE PREFABRICATED COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Progress Maschinen & Automation AG Julius-Durst-Strasse 100 39042 Brixen / IT | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLMETZER, Andreas Kaltern 39052 / IT | 02 /
ENDERES, Karl 39042 Brixen / IT | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21763294.2 | 12.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP72529 | Priority number, date | AT20200050679 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: AT 506792020 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022034185 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4196325 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4196325 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00, B28B5/02, B28B5/04, B28B7/18, B28B17/00, B28B19/00, B28B23/02, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B28B13/02 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B28B1/001 (EP,AT,US);
B28B13/0225 (EP);
B28B15/00 (US);
B28B17/0081 (EP);
B28B19/003 (EP);
B28B23/02 (EP);
B28B23/028 (EP);
B28B5/022 (EP);
B28B5/04 (EP);
B28B7/186 (EP);
B29C64/165 (AT);
B29C64/205 (AT);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | B28B1/00, B28B5/02, B28B5/04, B28B7/18, B28B17/00, B28B19/00, B28B23/02, B29C64/165, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES, VORZUGSWEISE FLÄCHIGEN, BETONFERTIGBAUELEMENTS | [2023/25] | English: | PLANT FOR PRODUCING A, PREFERABLY FLAT, CONCRETE PREFABRICATED COMPONENT | [2023/25] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR PRODUIRE UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION PRÉFABRIQUÉ EN BÉTON, DE PRÉFÉRENCE PLAN | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2005280185 (RUSSELL DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]DE102014011420 (DIEHL AIRCABIN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2017129134 (COLOMBO PAOLO [IT], et al); | [IY]US2018126668 (EL-SIBLANI ALI [US], et al); | [IY]WO2019197088 (PROGRESS MASCHINEN & AUTOMATION AG [IT]); | [A]WO2020011734 (NANTES ECOLE CENTRALE [FR]) | Examination | FR3083472 |